SOUTH CEFNCAEAU FAMILY CENTRE (TY ENFYS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a free open access facility for families/carers of children 0-18 in the community. We open 4 days a week term times, 3 days a week on school holidays, where families take part in play, enjoy healthy activities, get support and learn new skills. Families meet other families to make friends building a support network within their community. Trips are taken seasonally, funding permitting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 22 September 2000: Standard registration
- TY ENFYS (Working name)
- TY ENFYS FAMILY CENTRE (Working name)
- SOUTH CEFNCAEAU FAMILY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN TREHARNE | Chair | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Phillip Beer | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Lewis | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dawn Thomas | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ella Simmons Cllr | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Beer | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.79k | £29.66k | £86.10k | £77.58k | £90.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.86k | £36.30k | £54.28k | £92.58k | £92.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/2000 AND 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
I) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS WITHIN FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION OF A RESOURCE AND CENTRE AND BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GOOD PARENTING SKILLS. II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CEFNCAEAU AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TYENFYS
2 YNYSLAS
LLANELLI
SA14 9BT
- Phone:
- 01554749396
- Email:
- tyenfys@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window