SOUTH DEVON EVANGELICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Christian Evangelical Work in the South Devon area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 27 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE REGINALD BARTLETT | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Graham massey | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DAVID MARTIN BALL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
GILLIAN LESLEY HARRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
KATHRYN SARAH JANE BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £23.16k | £23.03k | £8.93k | £12.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.16k | £126.94k | £52.22k | £36.69k | £38.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH AND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY ASSEMBLY OR ASSEMBLIES OF BRETHREN MEETING FOR THE WORSHIP AND SERVICE OF GOD AND/OR THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST ON EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES AND OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS / WORK WHICH WOULD BE SUPPORTED BY ASSEMBLIES OF BRETHREN AT ANY PLACE OR PLACES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PURCHASE OR LEASING OR RENTING OF ANY LAND OR BUILDING OR THE ERECTION OF NEW ADDITIONAL BUILDINGS OR IN REPAIRS ALTERATIONS OR IMPROVEMENTS OR IN ANY OTHER WAY FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE TEACHINGS OF THE DOCTRINES AND OBSERVANCE OF THE PRACTICE OF NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH PRINCIPLES AS SET OUT IN THE BIBLE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Watergate
Broadhempston
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 6AU
- Phone:
- 01803921546
- Email:
- massey.graham@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window