CLIFTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By providing facilities for meetings,lectures,classes,training, and all other forms of recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Dave Barthram | Chair | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Cassidy | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra King | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Lowrence | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anderson | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Ross | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
MYLES NICHOLSON | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Gill Sott | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Silcock | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Stockton | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £23.16k | £14.87k | £15.77k | £17.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.39k | £40.83k | £9.66k | £23.70k | £16.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £536 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEDULE ADOPTED 27 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 JULY 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH WITH CLIFTON AND ADJOINING PARISHES IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE SUBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWALL WITH CLIFTON AND ADJOINING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHERRY TREES
COPMANROYD
NEWALL WITH CLIFTON
OTLEY
LS21 2EU
- Phone:
- 07857976729
- Email:
- cliftonvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
cliftonvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window