Farthinghoe School Ties

Charity number: 1085971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Farthinghoe School Ties is a parent/teacher group which raises money for the school to use for its children. This includes funding school trips and any extra equipment the teachers feel would benefit the education and welfare of the children. Activities can include school fetes, halloween parties, bingo nights and quiz nights for example.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £2,945
Total expenditure: £2,418

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SCHOOL TIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Jane Wise Chair 21 November 2023
None on record
Hayley Jane Radini Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.70k £332 £1.74k £1.24k £2.95k
Total expenditure £1.62k £1.30k £1.45k £1.77k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FARTHINGHOE PRIMARY SCHOOL
MAIN ROAD
FARTHINGHOE
BRACKLEY
NN13 5PA
Phone:
01295710406
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available