THE FRIENDS OF PORTWAY INFANTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events held during the school year to raise funds to provide luxury items for Portway Infants school:- 1. Christmas Cards 2. Christmas Fair 3. Quiz Night 4. Easter Fair 5. Sunflower Competition 6. Mother's Day Gifts 7. May Ball 8. Fathers Day Gifts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Devey | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa McSherry | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
jennifer Peters | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Curran | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Cloherty | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.20k | £4.22k | £5.52k | £7.21k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.41k | £2.94k | £2.91k | £8.26k | £7.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portway Infant School
Woodlands Road
Allestree
Derby
DE22 2HE
- Phone:
- 01332550702
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window