CHRIST CHURCH SPITALFIELDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity acts as a sinking fund for large maintenance and repair works on a historic church building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 08 May 2002: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH SPITALFIELDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren John Wolf | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Rupert Mowbray Wheeler | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN STRIDE | Trustee | 20 March 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WASSERFALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBERT WILLIAM ARTHUR SPIRING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.78k | £6.90k | £2.00k | £1.39k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.84k | £0 | £26.88k | £60 | £68 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 1ST DAY OF SEPTEMBER 2000. as amended on 03 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") THE MAINTENANCE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF CHRIST CHURCH SPITALFIELDS DESIGNED BY NICHOLAS HAWKSMOOR AS ONE OF THE FIFTY NEW CHURCHES BUILT BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 FOURNIER STREET
LONDON
E1 6QE
- Phone:
- 02073772440
- Email:
- foundation@ccspits.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window