GCR ROLLING STOCK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims are: 1. Rescue remaining rolling stock of the former Great Central Railway, to protect and restore, maintain for operational use and public instruction and enjoyment 2. Develop undercover storage and workshop facilities 3. Encourage traditional skills in wood and metal working and their transfer to next generations and create a centre of excellence for historic vehicle restoration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL LANG | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Roger Penson | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN QUICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.95k | £37.19k | £13.85k | £16.33k | £10.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.32k | £5.87k | £21.51k | £14.20k | £16.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16/02/2000 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 28/08/2000
Charitable objects
1)TO PROTECT, PRESERVE,ESTABLISH AND ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF A TRANSPORT HERITAGE EDUCATION AND PRESERVATION BODY ENGAGED SOLELY WITH ROLLING STOCK AND ARTEFACTS OF THE FORMER GREAT CENTRAL RAILWAY II)TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN RELATION TO THE HISTORY AND THE USE OF GCR ROLLING STOCK IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIGENOUS INDUSTRY AND TRANSPORT SYSTEMS AND TO BROADCAST SUCH INFORMATION OBTAINED BY OFFERING RESEARCH RESULTS FOR PUBLICATION AND THROUGH PRESENTATIONS BY SEMINARS,MEETINGS AND DISPLAYS TO APPROPRIATE PUBLICS. III)TO PROVIDE THE FACILITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, INCLUDING THE TRANSFER OF SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF HISTORIC GCR RAILWAY AND ROAD VEHICLES,THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH APPROPRIATE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND THE EMPLOYMENT OF PEOPLE TO DEVELOP PRACTICAL CRAFTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BUNGALOW
MELTON ROAD
SCALFORD
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE14 4UD
- Phone:
- 01664444545
- Website:
-
gcr-rollingstocktrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window