TOLERANCE INTERNATIONAL - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tolerance International-UK promotes tolerance and moderation between peoples, society and nature for the equal benefit of all and for future generations. Our vision is a world in which society recognizes and celebrates diversity. We thrive to engage in sustainable development programmes to help impoverished communities or communities and individuals in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 October 2000: Standard registration
- IRAN AID FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEON EDWARD JACK MENZIES RACONZIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR HAMID BAYAZI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.06k | £619 | £415 | £420 | £420 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.32k | £3.07k | £3.22k | £2.96k | £18.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 15 FEBRUARY 2007, 5 MARCH 2007 AND 21 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PEOPLE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, IN RELATION TO COMPARATIVE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY AND RELIGIOUS FUNDAMENTALISM. 3. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tolerance International UK
34 North End Road
LONDON
W14 0SH
- Phone:
- 02070975167
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window