NEWPORT AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of agriculture for the public benefit, particularly in Newport, Shropshire and the surrounding area, principally through the holding of an annual show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 20 April 2001: Standard registration
- NEWPORT SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Asson | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
George Painter | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Belcher | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clarkson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maddocks | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craddock | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT DOBSON | Trustee | 05 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.04k | £130.00k | £302.65k | £355.36k | £379.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.03k | £148.34k | £277.47k | £359.38k | £381.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.23k | £10.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (PARTICULARLY IN NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT) AND TO SUCH END GENERALLY TO IMPROVE IT ALL ITS BRANCHES, TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN IT AND IN ALL TRADES, CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH IT AND WITH RURAL CRAFTS AND INDUSTRIES OF INTEREST TO THE FARMING COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Linked charities
- 20 April 2001 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newport Show Office
The Lodge
Chetwynd Deer Park
Edgmond
NEWPORT
TF10 8EU
- Phone:
- 01952810814
- Email:
- info@newportshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window