SLYNE WITH HEST MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities in the hall include a pre-school, a toddlers group, private parties, jumble sales, coffee mornings, sequence dancing, scottish dancing, pilates classes and karate clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Peter Liptrott | Chair | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Burrows | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Allington | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Smith | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
VAUGHAN SIDNEY CHARLES AMES | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hardwick | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Haggan | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE COHEN-KINGSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.68k | £29.71k | £29.08k | £23.34k | £24.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.36k | £19.85k | £30.98k | £32.29k | £26.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.47k | £10.80k | £948 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 9 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SLYNE WITH HEST AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SLYNE WITH HEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 COASTAL ROAD
HEST BANK
LANCASTER
LA2 6HE
- Phone:
- 01524823377
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window