Financial history CHRIST-CITADEL INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (UNITED KINGDOM)

Charity number: 1088858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.28k £32.05k £41.31k £35.06k £73.03k
Total expenditure £33.62k £21.04k £40.33k £30.81k £57.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A