CHRIST-CITADEL INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (UNITED KINGDOM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH. PASTORAL CARE AND PRAYER SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES, SINGLES AND YOUNG PEOPLE. REGULAR PRAYER VIGILS FOR THE NATION AND OTHER NATIONS FOR PEACE AND PROSPERITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOSEPH ADDO ANSAH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MAYBLE TAMANDA MVULA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ERNEST ANSAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DINGA KENNETH MJOJO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSE TAWIAH DEANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH GEORGE WALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.28k | £32.05k | £41.31k | £35.06k | £73.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.62k | £21.04k | £40.33k | £30.81k | £57.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2021 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2021 | 271 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28 DECEMBER, 1999 AND AMENDED ON 20 OCTOBER, 2000.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FARFIELD AVENUE
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2PU
- Phone:
- 07720392900
- Email:
- cicnott@christ-citadel.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window