Financial history THE FRANCO BRITISH COLONY FOR CONVALESCENTS INCORPORATED

Charity number: 1089726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.35k £15.66k £9.96k £11.03k £11.64k
Total expenditure £50.02k £6.35k £7.51k £10.00k £3.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A