CHESHAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities are a) to maintain Chesham's heritage where appropriate and monitor and encourage improvements to the built environment and promote civic pride in Chesham. b) improve the ambience of Chesham. c) educate the public about the history of Chesham. d) encourage and carry out research into Chesham. e) improve the employment prospects for Chesham residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,892 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Salisbury | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Moss | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Graves | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Slater | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Charles Mariner McCulloch | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Edward Conboy | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | £11.53k | £13.55k | £5.00k | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.66k | £3.02k | £3.71k | £7.26k | £9.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JUNE 2000 as amended on 25 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND TO PROMOTE CIVIC PRIDE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (11) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (111) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (IV) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO SUBJECTS DIRECTLY CONNECTED WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
CHESHAM TOWN AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES OF CHARTRIDGE, CHOLESBURY-CUM-ST LEONARDS, ASHLEY GREEN, LATIMER AND CHESHAM BOIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Crossway
Chesham
Buckinghamshire
HP5 3LW
- Phone:
- 01494 778223
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window