Accounts and annual returns NEW ERA OUTREACH MINISTRIES INCORPORATING TRINITY HOUSE

Charity Number: 1088185
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 February 2025 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 February 2025 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 July 2024 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 July 2024 182 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 May 2023 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 June 2024 489 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 May 2024 1201 days late Download Open in new window