POTTERS BAR SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1082621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDING RELIGIOUS SERVICES, HEALING SERVICES AND WORKSHOPS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,355
Total expenditure: £3,377

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 2000: Standard registration
  • 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Margaret King Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Bleurose De-Sammy Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Mandy McKenna Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Michelle Mandeville Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Peter Kay Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Lorraine Randles Trustee 03 October 2013
None on record
Nicola Adams Trustee 17 July 2013
None on record
TRACEY AUSTIN Trustee 15 July 2011
None on record
CAROL ANN PATRICIA HERRING Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN GRIFFITHS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.91k £1.60k £3.05k £4.03k £11.36k
Total expenditure £4.83k £2.42k £1.09k £3.35k £3.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Potters Bar Spiritualist Church
Hill Rise
POTTERS BAR
Hertfordshire
EN6 2RS
Phone:
02084411674