Innovative Ministerial Association of Communities

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To inform and inspire Church and Community Leaders by providing resources, training, seminal, workshops, analysis and articles about our communities, so Leaders know how they can work with the Government. Raising awareness of violence among the youths, Helping Church and Community Leaders deal with abuse in different levels Domestic Violence: Facing the challenges of Domestic Violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 September 2000: Standard registration
- JOEL WORLD OUTREACH (Working name)
- MIRACLE TODAY (Working name)
- KINGDOM LIFE MEDIA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- MIRACLE TODAY - JOEL WORLD OUTREACH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joel Oluwafemi | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Daniels | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ruth Mutanda | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £6.50k | £2.80k | £3.00k | £16.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.10k | £7.20k | £3.00k | £2.95k | £16.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2009. as amended on 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE AND AFRICA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE AND AFRICA OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE, AFRICA, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
248 London Road
ROMFORD
RM7 9EL
- Phone:
- 07402741263
- Email:
- projectimacorg@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window