Financial history HIGH HALSTOW MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1083381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.08k £150 £8.28k £5.53k £9.53k
Total expenditure £12.14k £3.54k £2.79k £4.16k £7.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A