CHINGFORD NORTH AFTERNOON TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 07 August 2000: Standard registration
- 04 May 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £3.89k | £2.55k | £3.48k | £5.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £3.57k | £2.40k | £3.26k | £3.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 26 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 16 December 2009 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING):- 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window