Financial history NANPAN

Charity number: 1085863
Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £3.20k £4.34k £6.20k £5.08k £5.70k
Total expenditure £3.33k £7.47k £7.66k £2.08k £7.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A