WATFORD ASIAN COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To provide facilities in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the conditions of life for those persons in need of such facilities, particularly persons of Asian descent. Such facilities shall include the provision of a luncheon club for elderly persons and other recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hemant Mistry | Chair | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAYANTILAL MISTRY | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245 | £0 | £0 | £1.65k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 June 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST FEBRUARY 1999, AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, PARTICULARLY PERSONS OF ASIAN DESCENT. SUCH FACILITIES SHALL INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF A LUNCHEON CLUB FOR ELDERLY PERSONS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. (2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED, SUFFERING OR DISTRESS PARTICULARLY PERSONS OF ASIAN DESCENT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND THE SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 WESTFIELD AVENUE
WATFORD
WD24 7HF
- Phone:
- 07830375073
- Email:
- hrmistry@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window