MAREHAM LE FEN VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL LAWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT THE DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,260 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 August 2001: Standard registration
- MAREHAM LE FEN VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL LAWN (Working name)
- MAREHAM LE FEN AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Owen Junior Thomas | Chair | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Horgan | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Tamsin Palmer | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.12k | £2.26k | £18.32k | £25.13k | £51.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.88k | £18.29k | £12.59k | £24.94k | £54.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | £9.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
11 May 2025 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/08/2015 as amended on 12 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS. (2) SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25, THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
MAREHAM LE FEN, LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Royal Oak
Main Street
Mareham-Le-Fen
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE22 7RL
- Phone:
- 01507568920
- Email:
- luke@mlfcommunitycentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window