NFTE 2006
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 2000: Standard registration
- 20 July 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NIFTY (Working name)
- NFTE UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 31/05/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.60k | £472.08k | £381.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.72k | £264.11k | £430.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 22 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 23 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 11 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | 11 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY CERT OF INC ON CHANGE OF NAME 16 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING 1) THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS OR OTHER EDUCATORS TO TEACH THE NFTE PROGRAMME 2) THE TEACHING OF THE NFTE PROGRAMME 3) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE PARTICIPATING IN THE NFTE PROGRAMME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window