Accounts and annual returns THE MARION AND EDDIE O'GORMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1082771
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 07 April 2006 22 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2005 15 March 2006 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2004 27 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2004 Not Required