ADHD/ADD FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP FOR BRISTOL SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND NORTH SOMERSET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 October 2000: Standard registration
- 15 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £955 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 28 November 2005 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE CONDITION OF ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER AND ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDER (ADHD/ADD) AND TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS AND THEIR RELATIVES WHO HAVE OR SUSPECT THEY HAVE ADHD/ADD OR ASSOCIATED DISORDERS. FOR THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES LIVING IN THE BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, AND NORTH SOMERSET AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH A BS (BRISTOL) POSTCODE.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, AND NORTH SOMERSET AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH A BS(BRISTOL) POSTCODE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window