Accounts and annual returns LONG ITCHINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOC

Charity number: 1089448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2020 12 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2019 12 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2019 Not Required