Financial history LONG ITCHINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOC

Charity number: 1089448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/09/2019 11/09/2020 11/09/2021 11/09/2022 11/09/2023
Total gross income £12.84k £9.87k £2.64k £5.69k £3.89k
Total expenditure £16.32k £14.01k £7.14k £2.85k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A