THE CHAPEL-IN-LE-FRITH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants to individuals and groups within the Parish of Chapel-en-le-Frith in line with the Charities objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 April 2002: Standard registration
- BOWDEN HEAD SCHOOL- CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Hill | Chair | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Beswick | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jason Adshead | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £172 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 1ST DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSE OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY, BY PAYING THEIR FEES OR TRAVELLING OR OTHER INCIDENTAL EXPENSES OR BY PROVIDING THEM WITH MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, PROVIDED THAT CANDIDATES FOR THESE BENEFITS SHALL BE BOYS OR GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.B)IN MAKING ARRANGEMENTS APPROVED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ANY PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE SAID PARISH C) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES IN THE SAID PARISH
Area of benefit
CHAPEL EN LE FRITH, DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel-en-le-Frith Parish Council
Town Hall
51 Market Street
Chapel-en-le-Frith
High Peak
SK23 0HP
- Phone:
- 01298813320
- Email:
- CLERK@CHAPELPC.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window