WARWICK DISTRICT RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 August 2000: Standard registration
- 02 April 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.32k | £49.46k | £113 | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.67k | £162.31k | £2.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 16 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 16 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 9TH MARCH 2000,AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION 2. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS, ESPECIALLY IN THE WARWICK DISTRICT HEREIN AFTER KNOWN AS THE COUNCIL'S "AREA OF BENEFIT"
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window