THE BRENTWOOD HOLLY TREES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raising funds for the benefit of Holly trees Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 27 September 2001: Standard registration
- 09 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE HOLLY TREES TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.68k | £9.97k | £4.28k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £12.10k | £2.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 18 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 18 October 2010 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 19 October 2009 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON THE 12TH OF JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE HOLLY TREES COMMUNITY BY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PROVIDING OR ASSISTANCE ION THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FACILITIES OR ITEMS NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDING OR BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
HOLLY TREES COMMUNITY, IN ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window