LONDON POTTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote, maintain improve and advance education by encouraging an appreciation of ceramics in all its aspects but in particular by the arrangement of demonstrations, exhibitions, lectures and conferences and by such other means as the council shall determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melinda Marulli de Barletta | Chair | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Clare Goodwin | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Goldie Scott-Taylor | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Balsama Wilson | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet White | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ridgway | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Tripp | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HILL | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £9.73k | £22.48k | £41.71k | £49.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.96k | £6.88k | £21.79k | £27.94k | £40.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH JUNE 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY MINUTES OF THE MEETING HELD ON 6TH APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED ON 06 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ENCOURAGING AN APPRECIATION OF CERAMICS IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BUT IN PARTICULAR BY THE ARRANGEMENT OF DEMONSTRATIONS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND CONFERENCES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COUNCIL SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
85 Great Portland Street
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 02088764392
- Email:
- contact@londonpotters.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window