KING'S COMMUNITY CHURCH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community activities, Children's activities, Youth activities, Group and meals for older people, Community cafe, Debt advice, Counselling services, Fitness/ exercise classes, Dance classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £17,160 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,668 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
Governance
- 20 April 2001: Standard registration
- THE OAK TREE CENTRE (Working name)
- THE OAK TREE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER NOTT | Chair | 13 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Chipiliro Kalebe-Nyamongo | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Ann Stewart | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jay Anandou | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Tranter | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Webster | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Jane Beavan | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETER NOTT | Trustee | 01 January 1998 |
|
|
||||
JULIA BUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.22k | £69.61k | £56.49k | £74.51k | £71.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.57k | £76.96k | £84.49k | £94.06k | £70.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.25k | N/A | £20.13k | £17.16k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.87k | £20.90k | £4.00k | £1.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2013
Charitable objects
3.1.1. TO OPERATE THE COMMUNITY, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME FACILITIES SITUATED AT THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BU WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS AND QUALITY OF LIFE; 3.1.2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND ENHANCE EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES; 3.1.3. TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS; 3.1.4. TO RELIEVE POVERTY ; AND 3.1.5. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Area of benefit
AREA WITHIN A 3 MILE RADIUS OF THE CHURCH SITUATED AT THE CORNER OF TAME ROAD AND QUEENSWAY , OLDBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oak Tree Centre
Tame Road
OLDBURY
West Midlands
B68 0JP
- Phone:
- 01214224114
- Email:
- admin@oaktreecentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window