S.H. BISHOP WILL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PAYMENT OF INCOME FOR CHARITABLE (PRINCIPALLY EDUCATIONAL) PURPOSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 2000: Standard registration
- 22 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1158457 THE INNHOLDERS' CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.30k | £13.88k | £14.95k | £15.58k | £17.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.35k | £1.21k | £0 | £13.45k | £518.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 12 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 07 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 09 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 08 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 22ND JANUARY 1981
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE INNHOLDERS COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window