DIAMOND BLACKFAN ANAEMIA SUPPORT GROUP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support to families affected by Diamond Blackfan Anaemia. Provide information and education on the condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 02 November 2000: Standard registration
- DBA SUPPORT GROUP UK (Working name)
- DBA UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leisa Batkin | Chair | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor May Hudson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanne Hubbard | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Redmond | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jayson Whitaker | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.99k | £78.98k | £71.33k | £64.41k | £78.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.52k | £76.74k | £30.60k | £57.20k | £71.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 16 SEPTEMBER 2000 as amended on 09 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF THOSE SUFFERING EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY FROM DIAMOND BLACKFAN ANAEMIA (DBA), AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS. B) TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT DIAMOND BLACKFAN ANAEMIA (DBA).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND AND WALES, SCOTLAND AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Roman Place
Leeds
LS8 2DS
- Phone:
- 07797841489
- Email:
- info@diamondblackfan.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window