Unfold

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Unfold gets people where they want to be. Powered by volunteers, our one-to-one mentoring is for young people aged 10 - 25 and women with children over 5. Open to everyone, we target those who face the most challenges,with specialised programmes for refugees, peer support groups for women. Goal-focused, we boost confidence and well-being, connecting people to their community for lasting impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,200 from 4 government contract(s) and £31,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
246 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 September 2000: Standard registration
- WESTMINSTER BEFRIEND A FAMILY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Daniel Gibson | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marwa Nasr | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Swati Pandit | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ploy Wood | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ribhu Agrawal | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amaya Lopez-Jauregui | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohsin Qadir | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Yassukovich | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Rowan | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Grace Xia | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wright | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.55k | £260.88k | £244.40k | £389.75k | £443.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.27k | £149.07k | £222.67k | £372.60k | £490.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.17k | £14.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £45.72k | £31.90k | £31.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25/05/00 as amended on 03 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(I) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (II) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO, OR MALTREATMENT OF, CHILDREN; (III) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (IV) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF WESTMINSTER AND ITS ENVIRONS
Area of benefit
WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 GROSVENOR GARDENS
LONDON
SW1W 0DH
- Phone:
- 07591405514
- Email:
- hello@unfold.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window