Accounts and annual returns NEWTOWN COMMUNITY AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1083905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 04 January 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required