NEWTOWN COMMUNITY AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide and maintain Community park and associated facilities in Newtown, Shropshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 01 December 2000: Standard registration
- NCRA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Charlotte Grant | Chair | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Wilson | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nansen Slack | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Anne Lokier | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rutter | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Leanne Harper | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £8.37k | £3.98k | £30.79k | £7.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £921 | £11.88k | £31.73k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWTOWN, WEM AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A RECREATION GROUND AND ANY ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
NEWTOWN, WEM AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newtown Villa Farm
Newtown
Wem
SHREWSBURY
SY4 5NU
- Phone:
- 07860945100
- Email:
- ncracommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window