AMRIT VELA SEVA SANGAM

Charity Number: 1089791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITY; TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF THE ELDERLY & PROVIDING/ASSISTING THE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE & WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE & RELIEF OF POVERTY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROOP RAMNANI Trustee 14 November 2024
HOLY MISSION OF GURU NANAK
Received: On time
Manish Panjabi Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
MOHINI CHANDIRAMANI Trustee
HOLY MISSION OF GURU NANAK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.96k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.44k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 November 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 November 2024 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 January 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SECRETARY
318 EDGWARE ROAD
CRICKLEWOOD BROADWAY
LONDON
NW2 6QD
Phone:
02084501341
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available