BASLOW CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Baslow Choir is a mixed choir having in excess of 50 members. They perform a minimum of four concerts per year and actively encourage young and upcoming musicians to perform with them as guest artists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dotty Watkins | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Helen Calvert | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dobson | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Cable | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Elizabeth Wade | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Tipper | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Pitchfork | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Marples | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £1.59k | £1.83k | £11.10k | £15.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.71k | £3.63k | £2.75k | £9.36k | £12.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED, AS AMENDED 26 /02/1997, 27/01/1993, 3 /09/2001 AND 06/02/2002 AND 02/03/2016 as amended on 02 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHOIR, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hillhouse Court
New Road
Wingerworth
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S42 6TD
- Phone:
- 01246271052
- Email:
- admin@baslowchoir.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window