RICHARD WILCOX WELFARE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY ARE TO: - PREVENT CRUELTY AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE, ATTENTION AND PROTECTION. - RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH. - PROMOTE THE RESEARCH AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES. - RELIEVE PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT IN HOSPITAL OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE. - PROVIDE, MAI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 September 2000: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £701.04k | £209.89k | £154.02k | £142.56k | £165.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.73k | £525.39k | £434.55k | £257.93k | £673.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 19 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 24 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 07 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 03 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 14 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 20 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE, ATTENTION AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, ILL USAGE AND OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN KENNELS OR CATTERIES OR REFUGES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS; 2) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH; 3) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE AT THEIR DISCRETION; 4) TO RELIEVE PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT AT THE HOSPITALS OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE RELIEVE PATIENTS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 5) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF HOSPITALS AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS PROVIDING MEDICAL TREATMENT; 6) TO ASSIST OR PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window