THORNBURY LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO APPLY THEM FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHETHER FOR THEBENFIT OF ANY INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP OF PEOPLE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Hunt | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Robert Fish | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
DERRICK RICHARD HILDERSLEY | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Keith Townsend | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Richard Shorey | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN EVANS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP OF PEOPLE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ("THE OBJECTS") PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT APPLY THE TRUST FUND OR ANY PART THEREOF WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING THE APPROVAL OF THE LIONS CLUB AT A LIONS CLUB MEETING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornbury Lions Club
19-21 St. Mary Street
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 2AB
- Phone:
- 01454418618
- Email:
- thornburylions007@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thornburylions.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window