WILLIAM ROWDEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The assistance of young persons and others who have become paraplegic as a result of bleeding into the spinal cord. The principal recipient of this is William Rowden, but others are eleigible both to advice, emotional support and financial grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 February 2001: Standard registration
- SPINAL BLEEDS TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judy Robison | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr OLIVER JAMES COURTNEY WETHERED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW ROWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £990 | £960 | £960 | £720 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.32k | £1.04k | £257 | £1.00k | £765 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN HAMPSHIRE SUFFERING FROM PARALYSIS CAUSED BY SPINAL CAVERNOUS ANGIOMA'S AND SIMILAR VENOUS ABNORMALITIES IN THE SPINAL CORD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARLEY
LINKS ROAD
WINCHESTER
SO22 5HP
- Phone:
- 01794388981
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window