Accounts and annual returns GURU GOBIND SINGH NRI TRUST

Charity number: 1083406
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 April 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2022 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required