Financial history GURU GOBIND SINGH NRI TRUST

Charity number: 1083406
Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.54k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £15.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A