GURU GOBIND SINGH NRI TRUST

Charity number: 1083406
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Built a complex within the premises of the Shrines to provide better facilities for the pilgrims living outside India especially the younger generation who are reluctant to visit the historical gurudwaras due to lack of living facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BALDEV JIT SINGH SAINI Trustee 26 August 2011
None on record
NARESH KAUR Trustee
None on record
HARBHAJAN SINGH Trustee
None on record
Dr GURBAKHASH SINGH SANGHERA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.54k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £15.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 April 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2022 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
165 COMPTON ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 9JN
Phone:
01902773164
Website:

No information available