THE LOUISE DA-COCODIA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE INCLUSION BY INCREASING THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO AFRICAN CARIBBEANS BY PROVIDING STRUCTURED PROJECTS WHICH WILL HAVE DIRECT IMPACT ON THE EDUCATIONAL ACHIEVEMENTS OF YOUNG PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Manchester City
Governance
- 05 March 2001: Standard registration
- CARIOCCA EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valrie Yvonne Uyonia Tait Saunders | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simms Kyei | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cesaire Stephens | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA HENRY | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORNA ROBERTS | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANE WATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TOM NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.86k | £34.13k | £18.04k | £8.90k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.79k | £20.09k | £26.61k | £8.70k | £9.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN ANCESTRY IN GREATER MANCHESTER, BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 20, 70 Alexandra Road
Manchester
M16 7WD
- Phone:
- 07733125523
- Email:
- ldet.info@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window