WHOOPSADAISY BRIGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide conductive education to young disabled children to help them in their everyday life and increase their self-sufficiency. To advise and teach 'hands on' parents, teachers, carers and support assistants to enable children to be more independent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 25 October 2000: Standard registration
- THE BRIAN HOLLAND CHARITABLE COMPANY (Working name)
- WHOOPSADAISY (Working name)
- THE BRIAN HOLLAND CHARITABLE COMPANY (Previous name)
- THE BRIAN HOLLAND COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frederick St George | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grant Jason Jennings | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Donna Marie Westbury | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
TIM FENTON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.86k | £185.50k | £181.25k | £144.79k | £186.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.71k | £155.29k | £177.79k | £176.21k | £179.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.34k | £12.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2023 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 OCTOBER 2000, AS AMENDED 15TH NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC AND CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND PREVENTION OF CEREBRAL PALSY AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND REHABILITATION OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY TO ENABLE THEM TO GAIN PAID EMPLOYMENT AND DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STANMER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o West and Berry
The Projects
Nile House
Nile Street
BRIGHTON
- Phone:
- 01273554178
- Email:
- info@whoopsadaisy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window