Accounts and annual returns MERCURY ACTION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1086276
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 08 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 01 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2008 09 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required