Financial history MERCURY ACTION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1086276
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £5.88k £9.51k £6.05k £6.05k £2.68k
Total expenditure £8.91k £12.03k £8.29k £8.29k £27.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A