Financial history MANCHESTER MUSLIM FUNERAL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1093101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £57.97k £52.94k £60.81k £81.61k £100.04k
Total expenditure £39.27k £39.47k £54.85k £73.31k £76.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A